NC H1074 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-07-01 - Ref To Com On Health Care
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Schools/CC Facilities
Title
Schools/CC Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Hager [R] | Sen. Robert Bryan [R] | Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. Justin Burr [R] |
Rep. James Adams [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - A4 Hager Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A3 Millis Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A2 Brawley Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A1 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - A4 Hager Third Reading (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A3 Millis Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A2 Brawley Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - House - A1 Bryan Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Senate | Ref To Com On Health Care |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2016-07-01 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2016-06-30 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2016-06-30 | House | Amend Adopted A4 |
2016-06-29 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/30/2016 |
2016-06-29 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2016-06-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2016-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A3 |
2016-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A2 |
2016-06-28 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2016-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2016-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2016-06-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2016-06-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Regulatory Reform |
2016-06-23 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Environment, if favorable, Health |
2016-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2016-05-11 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2016-05-11 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2016-05-10 | House | Filed |