NC H1084 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-386
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-386
Summary
Revise LPG Dealer Requirements.
Title
Revise LPG Dealer Requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Dewey Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-386 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-21 | Ratified | |
2009-07-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-16 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-14 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-12 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-11 | Placed On Cal For 5/12/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1084 |