NC H1098 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-09 - Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Disapprove 18E Rules
Title
Disapprove 18E Rules
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Brody [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/14/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-09 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/15/2022 |
2022-06-09 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-08 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/09/2022 |
2022-06-08 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2022-06-08 | House | Added to Calendar |
2022-06-08 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2022-06-08 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-06-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-06-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2022-05-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Local Government - Land Use, Planning and Development, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2022-05-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2022-05-26 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Admin. Procedure Oversight Comm.
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Commissions
General Assembly
Infrastructure
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Rules Objection Filed
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Wells
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Commissions
General Assembly
Infrastructure
Public
Public Health
Public Health Comn.
Rules Objection Filed
Utilities
Water & Sewer Systems
Wells
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
150B | 21.3 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
150B | 21.3A | (n/a) | Citation Text |