NC H1106 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 15 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-19 - Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Erosion Control Designer Certification
Title
Erosion Control Designer Certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-18 - House - Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-19 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-18 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-06-18 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-28 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2014-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-05-19 | House | Ref to the Com on Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Environment |
2014-05-19 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-15 | House | Filed |