NC H1110 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-03 - Ch. SL 2009-400
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 3 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-03 - Ch. SL 2009-400
Summary
Clarify/Alien. of Affection/Crim. Conversat'n.
Title
Clarify/Alien. of Affection/Crim. Conversat'n.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-03 | Ch. SL 2009-400 | |
2009-08-03 | Signed By Gov. 8/3/2009 | |
2009-07-24 | Pres. To Gov. 7/24/2009 | |
2009-07-23 | Ratified | |
2009-07-22 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-20 | Placed On Cal For 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-16 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-07-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-07-13 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-07-13 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-07-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-08 | Amend Failed #1 | |
2009-07-07 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-07-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-14 | Amend Failed 3 | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Failed 2 | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-12 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-07 | Ref to the Com on Ways and Means/Broadband Connectivity, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-04-07 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-06 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1110 |