NC H112 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-23 - Ch. SL 2009-9
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 23 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-23 - Ch. SL 2009-9
Summary
Wallace/Community Development Target Areas.
Title
Wallace/Community Development Target Areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Ch. SL 2009-9 | |
2009-03-23 | Ratified | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-03-02 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2009-03-02 | Rec From House | |
2009-02-26 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Placed On Cal For 2/26/2009 | |
2009-02-25 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-02-25 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-02-11 | Ref To Com On Local Government II | |
2009-02-11 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-10 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H112 |