NC H1122 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-28 - Ch. SL 2012-111
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Martin County Fire Districts
Title
Martin County Fire Districts
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Tolson [D] | Rep. Edith Warren [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-06-18 - House - Third Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-06-14 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-28 | Ch. SL 2012-111 | |
2012-06-28 | Ratified | |
2012-06-28 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-27 | Placed On Cal For 6/27/2012 | |
2012-06-27 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-26 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2012-06-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-19 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2012-06-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-06-19 | Rec From House | |
2012-06-18 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-14 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2012-06-13 | Placed On Cal For 6/14/2012 | |
2012-06-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-13 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-06-07 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2012-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2012-05-24 | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance | |
2012-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2012-05-23 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S883 (Same As) 2012-05-24 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government