NC H1144 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study 1%/$80 Rate for Mill Machinery
Title
Study 1%/$80 Rate for Mill Machinery
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-07-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-21 | House | Ref To Com On Finance |
2014-05-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-20 | House | Filed |