NC H121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Expunction Related to RTA/No Conviction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expunction Related to RTA/No Conviction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-15 - House - Third Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - A1 Stevens Second Reading (Y: 96 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-16SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-16SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-16HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-15HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-15HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-11HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-11HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-09HousePlaced On Cal For 04/11/2019
2019-04-08HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-08HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 3
2019-03-26HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-26HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-03-25HousePlaced On Cal For 03/27/2019
2019-03-25HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-25HouseReptd Fav Com Sub 2
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-21HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-21HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback