NC H1212 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Ch. SL 2014-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-17 - Ch. SL 2014-74
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Burlington Charter/Revision and Consolidation
Title
Burlington Charter/Revision and Consolidation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-07-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-07-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-06-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-17 | Ch. SL 2014-74 | |
2014-07-17 | Ratified | |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2014-07-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Placed on Today's Supplemental Calendar |
2014-07-15 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-07-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-06-24 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-06-24 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-06-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-06-19 | House | Placed On Cal For 06/23/2014 |
2014-06-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-06-19 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2014-06-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2014-06-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2014-05-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Government, if favorable, Finance |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S861 (Same As) 2014-05-28 - Ref To Com On State and Local Government