NC H1234 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-07-08 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Ferry Tolling/Replacement Funds
Title
Ferry Tolling/Replacement Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-07-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-08 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-07-08 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2014-07-03 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2014-07-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2014-07-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2014-07-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2014-07-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2014-07-02 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2014-05-28 | House | Ref To Com On Appropriations |
2014-05-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2014-05-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S792 (Same As) 2014-05-20 - Ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Appropriations/Base Budget