NC H1251 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Ch. SL 2010-6
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Colonial Spanish Mustang as State Horse
Title
Colonial Spanish Mustang as State Horse
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 22 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-07 | Ch. SL 2010-6 | |
2010-06-07 | Signed By Gov. 6/7/2010 | |
2010-06-07 | Pres. To Gov. 6/4/2010 | |
2010-06-03 | Ratified | |
2010-06-02 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-06-01 | Placed On Cal For 6/2/2010 | |
2010-06-01 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-05-31 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-05-31 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-05-27 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-05-26 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-19 | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |