NC H1294 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-286
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on July 10 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-10 - Ch. SL 2009-286
Summary
NC Risk Pool Premiums/Notice Requirements.
Title
NC Risk Pool Premiums/Notice Requirements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-10 | Ch. SL 2009-286 | |
2009-07-10 | Signed By Gov. 7/10/2009 | |
2009-07-02 | Pres. To Gov. 7/2/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Ratified | |
2009-06-30 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-29 | Placed On Cal For 6/30/2009 | |
2009-06-29 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-29 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-25 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-06-25 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2009-06-08 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-06-08 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-03 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-03 | Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-06-02 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-13 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed On Cal For 5/13/2009 | |
2009-05-11 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-11 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-05-05 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-05-05 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-09 | Ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-04-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-08 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1294 |