NC H138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-27 - Ch. SL 2017-194
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revise Gang Laws
Title
Revise Gang Laws
Sponsors
Rep. Allen McNeill [R] | Rep. John Faircloth [R] | Rep. Patricia Hurley [R] | Rep. Rena Turner [R] |
Rep. Bert Jones [R] | Sen. Robert Steinburg [R] | Rep. Harry Warren [R] | Rep. Donna White [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - A1 John Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - A1 John Second Reading (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-27 | Ch. SL 2017-194 | |
2017-07-27 | Signed by Gov. 7/27/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Pres. To Gov. 6/28/2017 | |
2017-06-28 | Ratified | |
2017-06-28 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2017-06-28 | House | Concurred In S/Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2017-06-28 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2017-06-28 | House | Special Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Special Message Sent To House |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Engrossed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-06-26 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2017-03-23 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Amend Adopted A1 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/23/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Withdrawn From Cal |
2017-03-21 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/22/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2017-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav |
2017-02-21 | House | Ref To Com On Judiciary II |
2017-02-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2017-02-20 | House | Filed |