NC H14 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Ch. SL 2012-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on June 25 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-25 - Ch. SL 2012-57
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use R&R Funds for 2011-2012 Medicaid Costs
Title
Use R&R Funds for 2011-2012 Medicaid Costs
Sponsors
Rep. George Cleveland [R] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] | Rep. David Martin [D] |
Rep. William McGee [R] | Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. John Torbett [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-06-21 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 103 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - A1 Lucas\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - A1 Lucas\Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-07 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-25 | Ch. SL 2012-57 | |
2012-06-25 | Signed By Gov. 6/25/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Pres. To Gov. 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Ratified | |
2012-06-21 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2012-06-21 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2012-06-21 | Rec From Senate | |
2012-06-21 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2012-06-21 | Placed On Cal For 6/21/2012 | |
2012-06-21 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2012-06-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-08 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-07 | Placed On Cal For 6/7/2011 | |
2011-06-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-07 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-28 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2011-02-28 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-24 | Placed On Cal For 2/28/2011 | |
2011-02-24 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-02-24 | Serial Referral to Appropriations/Transportation Stricken | |
2011-02-24 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-01-31 | Ref to the Com on Military and Homeland Security, if favorable, Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation | |
2011-01-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |