NC H140 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Ch. SL 2011-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Ch. SL 2011-51
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Oak Island/Recall Officials
Title
Oak Island/Recall Officials
Sponsors
Rep. Dewey Hill [D] | Rep. Francis Iler [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 4 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Ch. SL 2011-51 | |
2011-04-21 | Ratified | |
2011-04-20 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-04-19 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-09 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Rec From House | |
2011-03-08 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-07 | Placed On Cal For 3/8/2011 | |
2011-03-07 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-07 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-21 | Ref To Com On Government | |
2011-02-21 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-17 | Filed |