NC H140 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Ch. SL 2015-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-16 - Ch. SL 2015-8
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Lineman Appreciation Day in NC
Title
Lineman Appreciation Day in NC
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-16 | Ch. SL 2015-8 | |
2015-04-16 | Signed by Gov. 4/16/2015 | |
2015-04-15 | Pres. To Gov. 4/15/2015 | |
2015-04-15 | Ratified | |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Re-ref Com On State and Local Government |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-31 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/01/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-31 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-04 | House | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-03-04 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Filed |