NC H1410 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-20 - Ref To Com On Commerce
Summary
Building Code Exclusion/Hot Water Heaters.
Title
Building Code Exclusion/Hot Water Heaters.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-20 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-05-14 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-13 | Placed On Cal For 5/14/2009 | |
2009-05-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-06 | Re-ref Com On State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, State Government/State Personnel | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1410 |