NC H1445 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Status: Introduced on April 9 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-10 - Re-ref Com On Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Summary
Reform Bill of 2009.
Title
Reform Bill of 2009.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-10 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-08-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-08-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-08-06 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-07-13 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-07-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-13 | Ref to the Com on Judiciary III, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Appropriations | |
2009-04-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-09 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1445 |