NC H147 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-04-01 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Summary
DHHS Workgroup on Mixed Populations ACH.
Title
DHHS Workgroup on Mixed Populations ACH.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Health | |
2009-02-12 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S196 (Same As) 2011-03-03 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H147 |