NC H151 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Rules and Operations of the Senate Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Katelyn's Law

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Katelyn's Law

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - House - A1 Floyd M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - A3 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 110 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - A1 Floyd Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HouseOrdered Engrossed
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAmend Adopted A3
2019-04-16HouseAmendment Withdrawn A1
2019-04-16HouseAmend Recon A1
2019-04-15HousePlaced On Cal For 04/16/2019
2019-04-15HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-15HouseAmendment Withdrawn A2
2019-04-15HouseAmend Adopted A1
2019-04-11HousePlaced On Cal For 04/15/2019
2019-04-11HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-11HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-05HouseRe-ref Com On State and Local Government
2019-03-05HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-02-25HouseRef to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-25HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-02-21HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback