NC H1523 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-374
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 31 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-31 - Ch. SL 2009-374
Summary
S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act.
Title
S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Daniel Blue [D] | Rep. Bill Faison [D] | Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Sandra Hughes [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-31 | Ch. SL 2009-374 | |
2009-07-31 | Signed By Gov. 7/31/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Pres. To Gov. 7/22/2009 | |
2009-07-22 | Ratified | |
2009-07-21 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-20 | Placed On Cal For 7/21/2009 | |
2009-07-20 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-16 | Conf Report Adopted | |
2009-07-16 | Cal For Immediate Consid | |
2009-07-16 | Conf Com Reported | |
2009-07-14 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-09 | Conf Com Appointed | |
2009-07-09 | Failed concur in S/Com Sub | |
2009-07-07 | Postponed To 7/9/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Postponed To 7/7/2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-30 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-23 | Ref To Com On Financial Institutions | |
2009-06-23 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-18 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-06-17 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-06-11 | Placed On Cal For 6/17/2009 | |
2009-06-11 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2009-06-10 | Com Amend Adopted #1 | |
2009-06-10 | Reptd Fav As Amended | |
2009-06-03 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-06-03 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-06-03 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-05-20 | Ref to Commerce. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2009-05-12 | Rec From House | |
2009-05-11 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-07 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2009-05-06 | Placed On Cal For 5/7/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-05-06 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-30 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2009-04-30 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-20 | Ref to the Com on Financial Institutions, if favorable, Finance | |
2009-04-20 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-04-16 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H1523 |