NC H157 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Ch. SL 2015-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-16 - Ch. SL 2015-1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Environmental Laws
Title
Amend Environmental Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 37 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 76 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - A1 Reives Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 70 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion 12 - Add to Cal (Y: 73 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Ch. SL 2015-1 | |
2015-03-16 | Signed by Gov. 3/16/2015 | |
2015-03-16 | Pres. To Gov. 3/16/2015 | |
2015-03-16 | Ratified | |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Today's Calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2015-03-11 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-03-11 | House | Amend Failed A1 |
2015-03-11 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-03-11 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-03-11 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2015-03-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2015-03-10 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-03-10 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-03-10 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-05 | House | Ref To Com On Environment |
2015-03-05 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Filed |