NC H16 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-10 - Re-ref Com On Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Children's Advocacy Centers Funds
Title
Children's Advocacy Centers Funds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-10 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-01-31 | Ref To Com On Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services | |
2011-01-31 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S10 (Same As) 2011-02-01 - Ref To Com On Appropriations/Base Budget