NC H163 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Ch. SL 2015-99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Ch. SL 2015-99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Captive Insurance Amendments
Title
Captive Insurance Amendments
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Johnson [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Collins [R] | Rep. Paul Tine [D] | Rep. Kenneth Waddell [D] |
Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-19 | Ch. SL 2015-99 | |
2015-06-19 | Signed by Gov. 6/19/2015 | |
2015-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2015 | |
2015-06-08 | Ratified | |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Insurance |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-16 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-15 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-15 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-15 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | Ref To Com On Insurance |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Filed |