NC H1692 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-11 - Ch. SL 2010-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-2)
Status: Passed on July 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-11 - Ch. SL 2010-88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Medicaid Dental/Special Needs Population
Title
Medicaid Dental/Special Needs Population
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-24 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-11 | Ch. SL 2010-88 | |
2010-07-11 | Signed By Gov. 7/11/2010 | |
2010-07-07 | Pres. To Gov. 7/7/2010 | |
2010-07-06 | Ratified | |
2010-07-01 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-06-30 | Placed On Cal For 7/1/2010 | |
2010-06-30 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-30 | Reptd Fav To Concur | |
2010-06-24 | Ref To Com On Aging | |
2010-06-24 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-06-24 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-23 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-06-23 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-10 | Ref To Com On Health Care | |
2010-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/9/2010 | |
2010-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-13 | Ref to the Com on Aging, if favorable, Health | |
2010-05-13 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-12 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1192 (Same As) 2010-05-18 - Ref To Com On Health Care