NC H170 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing Care Retirement Communities Act.-AB
Title
Continuing Care Retirement Communities Act.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Setzer [R] | Rep. Chris Humphrey [R] | Rep. Deb Butler [D] | Rep. Mary Harrison [D] |
Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Jeffrey McNeely [R] | Rep. Ben Moss [R] | Rep. Bill Ward [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-13 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-02-23 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Insurance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-22 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S145 (Same As) 2023-06-28 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Administrative Code
Administrative Rules
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Continuing Care Facilities
Contracts
Corporations
Council Of State
Fees
For-profit
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Licenses & Permits
Notification
Public
Public Officials
Reporting
Administrative Rules
Commerce
Consumer Protection
Continuing Care Facilities
Contracts
Corporations
Council Of State
Fees
For-profit
Health Services
Insurance
Insurance Commissioner
Insurance Dept.
Licenses & Permits
Notification
Public
Public Officials
Reporting
Code Citations
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2023/H170 |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H170v0.pdf |
Text | https://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2023/Bills/House/PDF/H170v1.pdf |