NC H1716 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. SL 2010-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 24 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-24 - Ch. SL 2010-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allow Hamlet to Operate Motorized ATVs
Title
Allow Hamlet to Operate Motorized ATVs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-24 | Ch. SL 2010-19 | |
2010-06-24 | Ratified | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-06-14 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-11 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-10 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-09 | Placed On Cal For 6/10/2010 | |
2010-06-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-09 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-26 | Re-ref Com On Transportation | |
2010-05-26 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-17 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Transportation | |
2010-05-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-13 | Filed |