NC H1777 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-4)
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 18 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-01 - Re-ref Com On Health
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Child Nutrition Program
Title
Study Child Nutrition Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-01 | Re-ref Com On Health | |
2010-06-01 | Reptd Fav | |
2010-05-19 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Health | |
2010-05-19 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1152 (Same As) 2010-07-20 - Ch. SL 2010-115