NC H182 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Ch. SL 2009-310
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-17 - Ch. SL 2009-310
Summary
Traffic Calming Devices/Res. Subdivisions
Title
Traffic Calming Devices/Res. Subdivisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-17 | Ch. SL 2009-310 | |
2009-07-17 | Signed By Gov. 7/17/2009 | |
2009-07-09 | Pres. To Gov. 7/9/2009 | |
2009-07-08 | Ratified | |
2009-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-07-01 | Placed On Cal For 7/7/2009 | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-06-02 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2009-06-02 | Reptd Fav | |
2009-04-15 | Ref To Com On Commerce | |
2009-04-15 | Rec From House | |
2009-04-14 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-04-13 | Placed On Cal For 4/14/2009 | |
2009-04-13 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-04-13 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-04-01 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary III | |
2009-04-01 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-18 | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Judiciary III | |
2009-02-18 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-02-17 | Filed |
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H182 |