NC H1921 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Ch. SL 2010-83
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Wake Email Address Lists/Electronic Access
Title
Wake Email Address Lists/Electronic Access
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Dollar [R] | Rep. Rosa Gill [D] | Rep. Chris Heagarty [D] | Rep. Darren Jackson [D] |
Rep. David Martin [D] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D] | Rep. Paul Stam [R] | Rep. Jennifer Weiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Ch. SL 2010-83 | |
2010-07-09 | Ratified | |
2010-07-08 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2010-07-08 | Placed On Cal For 7/8/2010 | |
2010-07-08 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2010-07-07 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2010-07-07 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2010-07-07 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-07-06 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2010-07-06 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-06-28 | Ref To Com On State and Local Government | |
2010-06-24 | Rec From House | |
2010-06-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2010-06-22 | Placed On Cal For 6/23/2010 | |
2010-06-22 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2010-06-22 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2010-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary I | |
2010-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2010-05-24 | Ref to the Com on Local Government I, if favorable, Judiciary I | |
2010-05-24 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2010-05-20 | Filed |