NC H199 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
DMV Proposed Legislative Changes.-AB
Title
DMV Proposed Legislative Changes.-AB
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Transportation. If fav, re-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Special Message Received From House |
2023-05-02 | House | Special Message Sent To Senate |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-05-02 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-05-02 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-05-02 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-05-02 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-04-26 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2023-04-26 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-27 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-27 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Boards
Commerce
Contracts
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Elections
Electronic Government
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Services
Id Systems
Ignition Interlock Devices
Information Technology
Internet
Judges
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Liens
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Motor Fleet
Motor Vehicles
Oaths
Privatization
Property
Property-state Government
Public
Public Officials
Public Records
Records
Retailing
Safety
Safety Equipment
Social Security
State Board Of
Studies
Titles
Transportation Dept.
Commerce
Contracts
Courts
Debtor & Creditor
Dmv
Drivers Licenses
Elections
Electronic Government
Emergency Equipment
Emergency Medical Services
Emergency Services
Fees
Firefighters & Firefighting
Health Services
Id Systems
Ignition Interlock Devices
Information Technology
Internet
Judges
License Plates
Licenses & Permits
Liens
Monitoring & Surveillance Systems
Motor Fleet
Motor Vehicles
Oaths
Privatization
Property
Property-state Government
Public
Public Officials
Public Records
Records
Retailing
Safety
Safety Equipment
Social Security
State Board Of
Studies
Titles
Transportation Dept.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
1 | 105 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
143 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
143 | 341 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
20 | 131 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 17.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 292.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 347 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 4.01 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 42 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 43.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 63.02 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 63.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 7 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 72 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 79.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 79.1B | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 79.2 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 79.5 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
20 | 84 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
44A | 4 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 201 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
66 | 201.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |