NC H210 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 23-9)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Reduce Barriers to State Employment
Title
Reduce Barriers to State Employment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Second Reading (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-03-30 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-03-29 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-03-28 | House | Placed On Cal For 03/29/2023 |
2023-03-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-03-28 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-23 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-23 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-02-28 | House | Ref to the Com on State Personnel, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-02-27 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S239 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
Subjects
Commissions
Employment
Government Employees
Human Resources Comn.
Personnel
Public
Reporting
State Employees
Employment
Government Employees
Human Resources Comn.
Personnel
Public
Reporting
State Employees
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
126 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
126 | 8.6 | (n/a) | Citation Text |