NC H22 | 2009 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-139
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Ch. SL 2009-139
Summary
Enhance Youth Employment Protections.
Title
Enhance Youth Employment Protections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Ch. SL 2009-139 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed By Gov. 6/19/2009 | |
2009-06-09 | Pres. To Gov. 6/9/2009 | |
2009-06-08 | Ratified | |
2009-06-04 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2009-06-03 | Placed On Cal For 6/4/2009 | |
2009-06-03 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-06-03 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2009-06-01 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-05-27 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2009-05-27 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-03-24 | Ref To Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-24 | Rec From House | |
2009-03-19 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2009-03-18 | Placed On Cal For 3/19/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2009-03-18 | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 | |
2009-03-12 | Re-ref Com On Judiciary II | |
2009-03-12 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2009-02-12 | Ref to the Com on Commerce, Small Business, and Entrepreneurship, if favorable, Judiciary II | |
2009-02-12 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2009-02-02 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2009-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2009-01-29 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S276 (Same As) 2011-03-10 - Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
North Carolina State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.ncga.state.nc.us/gascripts/BillLookUp/BillLookUp.pl?Session=2009&BillID=H22 |