NC H22 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Ch. SL 2011-391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Ch. SL 2011-391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
2011 Budget Technical Corrections
Title
2011 Budget Technical Corrections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 105 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 2 (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-18 - House - M11 Concur\Sen. Amd. 1 (Y: 109 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 2 (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-06-16 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Ch. SL 2011-391 | |
2011-06-30 | Signed By Gov. 6/30/2011 | |
2011-06-20 | Pres. To Gov. 6/20/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Ratified | |
2011-06-18 | Concurred in S/Com Sub As Amended | |
2011-06-18 | Concurred In S Amend 2 | |
2011-06-18 | Concurred In S Amend 1 | |
2011-06-18 | Placed On Cal For 6/18/2011 | |
2011-06-18 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-18 | Rec to Concur in SCS as Amended | |
2011-06-17 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-17 | Amend Adopted 2 | |
2011-06-16 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-16 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-06-16 | Placed On Cal For 6/16/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-06-16 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-06-16 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-06-16 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-03-29 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations/Base Budget | |
2011-03-29 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-03-23 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-03-23 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-10 | Ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Finance | |
2011-03-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-03-09 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-08 | Placed On Cal For 3/9/2011 | |
2011-03-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-03-01 | Re-ref Com On Appropriations | |
2011-03-01 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-02-15 | Re-ref Com On Finance | |
2011-02-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-02-02 | Ref to the Com on Education, if favorable, Finance | |
2011-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |