NC H24 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 24 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-24 - Ch. SL 2011-292
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Expand Duties of Economic Dev. Oversight Comm
Title
Expand Duties of Economic Dev. Oversight Comm
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - House - Third Reading (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-08 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | Ch. SL 2011-292 | |
2011-06-24 | Signed By Gov. 6/24/2011 | |
2011-06-17 | Pres. To Gov. 6/17/2011 | |
2011-06-16 | Ratified | |
2011-06-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-15 | Placed On Cal For 6/15/2011 | |
2011-06-15 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-10 | Ref To Com On Finance | |
2011-06-10 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-06-10 | Rec From House | |
2011-06-09 | Passed 3rd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Passed 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-08 | Placed On Cal For 6/8/2011 | |
2011-06-08 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-06-08 | Reptd Fav | |
2011-06-07 | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Business and Labor | |
2011-04-06 | Re-ref Com On Commerce and Job Development | |
2011-04-06 | Withdrawn From Com | |
2011-02-02 | Ref To Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House | |
2011-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S14 (Same As) 2011-02-01 - Ref To Com On Finance