NC H254 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Ch. SL 2015-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-17 - Ch. SL 2015-161
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Protect National Guard Reemployment Rights
Title
Protect National Guard Reemployment Rights
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-15 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-17 | Ch. SL 2015-161 | |
2015-07-17 | Signed by Gov. 7/17/2015 | |
2015-07-17 | Pres. To Gov. 7/17/2015 | |
2015-07-16 | Ratified | |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-07-15 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-07-14 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Commerce |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-01 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-01 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-01 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-03-18 | House | Ref To Com On Homeland Security, Military, and Veterans Affairs |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S280 (Same As) 2015-03-23 - Re-ref Com On Workforce and Economic Development