NC H27 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Ch. SL 2011-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6)
Status: Passed on March 31 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-31 - Ch. SL 2011-19
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Forensic Sciences Act
Title
Forensic Sciences Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - A1 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - House - A1 Glazier\Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-31 | Ch. SL 2011-19 | |
2011-03-31 | Signed By Gov. 3/31/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Pres. To Gov. 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Ratified | |
2011-03-28 | Concurred In S/Com Sub | |
2011-03-28 | Placed On Cal For 3/28/2011 | |
2011-03-28 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-03-28 | Rec To Concur S Com Sub | |
2011-03-23 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-03-22 | Placed On Cal For 3/23/2011 | |
2011-03-22 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-03-21 | Com Substitute Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-17 | Ref To Com On Judiciary I | |
2011-02-17 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-16 | Rec From House | |
2011-02-15 | Ordered Engrossed | |
2011-02-15 | Passed 2nd & 3rd Reading | |
2011-02-15 | Amend Adopted 1 | |
2011-02-10 | Placed On Cal For 2/15/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | Withdrawn From Cal | |
2011-02-09 | Placed On Cal For 2/10/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) | |
2011-02-09 | Reptd Fav Com Substitute | |
2011-02-02 | Ref To Com On Judiciary Subcommittee B | |
2011-02-02 | Passed 1st Reading | |
2011-02-01 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S40 (Same As) 2011-02-08 - Ref To Com On Judiciary I