NC H287 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-14 - Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Health Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Educate Patients About Opioid Antagonists
Title
Educate Patients About Opioid Antagonists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-04 - House - Second Reading (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-14 | Senate | Re-ref to Health Care. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-05 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-04 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-04 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub 2 |
2023-03-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-03-08 | House | Ref to the Com on Health, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-03-08 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Controlled Substances
Health Education
Health Services
Occupations
Patient Rights
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Public
Public Health
Health Education
Health Services
Occupations
Patient Rights
Pharmaceuticals
Pharmacists & Pharmacies
Public
Public Health
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
90 | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
90 | 12.8 | (n/a) | Citation Text |