NC H298 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Public Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-22 - Re-ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform
Pending: House Public Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Affordable and Reliable Energy Act
Title
Affordable and Reliable Energy Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Re-ref to the Com on Public Utilities and Energy, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform |
2013-04-22 | House | Withdrawn From Com |
2013-04-09 | House | Re-ref Com On Environment |
2013-04-09 | House | Ordered Engrossed |
2013-04-09 | House | Reptd Fav Com Sub Amend |
2013-03-27 | House | Serial Referral order has been changed |
2013-03-27 | House | Assigned To Commerce and Job Development Subcommittee on Energy and Emerging Markets |
2013-03-14 | House | Ref to the Com on Commerce and Job Development, if favorable, Environment, if favorable, Regulatory Reform, if favorable, Public Utilities and Energy |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S365 (Same As) 2013-05-01 - Re-ref Com On Commerce