NC H3 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ch. SL 2021-140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-09 - Ch. SL 2021-140
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Craven Bd of Ed/Partisan Electoral Districts
Title
Craven Bd of Ed/Partisan Electoral Districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-09-08 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 58 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-09 | Ch. SL 2021-140 | |
2021-09-09 | Ratified | |
2021-09-08 | House | Ordered Enrolled |
2021-09-08 | House | Concurred In S Com Sub |
2021-09-03 | House | Placed On Cal For 09/08/2021 |
2021-09-03 | House | Cal Pursuant 36(b) |
2021-09-01 | House | Regular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub |
2021-09-01 | Senate | Regular Message Sent To House |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-08-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Com Substitute Adopted |
2021-08-25 | Senate | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Re-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-08-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Re-ref to Redistricting and Elections. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2021-05-07 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2021-05-06 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/06/2021 |
2021-05-05 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav |
2021-05-05 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-05-05 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2021-05-05 | House | Serial Referral To Local Government Stricken |
2021-01-28 | House | Ref to the Com on Election Law and Campaign Finance Reform, if favorable, Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2021-01-28 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2021-01-27 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Beaufort
Boards
Carteret County
Chaptered
Counties
County Commissioners
Craven County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
New Bern
Political Parties
Ratified
Referendum & Initiative
Residency
Secondary Education
Title Change
Boards
Carteret County
Chaptered
Counties
County Commissioners
Craven County
Education
Education Boards
Elections
Elementary Education
Kindergarten
Local
Local Government
Municipalities
New Bern
Political Parties
Ratified
Referendum & Initiative
Residency
Secondary Education
Title Change
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115 | 74.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text | |
115C | 37.1 | (n/a) | Citation Text |