NC H323 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Enrolled on July 10 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Assess Costs of Local LEO Crime Lab Analysis

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Assess Costs of Local LEO Crime Lab Analysis

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-10 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12 Pres. To Gov. 7/12/2019
2019-07-11 Ratified
2019-07-10SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-10SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-07-10SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-07-09SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/10/2019
2019-07-09SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-08SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/09/2019
2019-07-08SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-02SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/08/2019
2019-07-02SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-07-01SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/02/2019
2019-07-01SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenateWithdrawn From Cal
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref to Judiciary. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-17SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-04-17SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-04-17SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-04-17HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-16HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-16HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-16HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-16HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-16HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-15HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-15HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-27HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-03-27HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-12HouseRef to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-12HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback