NC H365 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 14 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Re-ref Com On Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

State Board Construction Contract Claim

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board Construction Contract Claim

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseRe-ref Com On Judiciary
2019-04-10HouseReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-03-18HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-18HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S255 (Same As) 2019-05-20 - Re-ref to the Com on Judiciary, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback