NC H378 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-16 - Ref To Com On Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Study Oversight of MPOs
Title
Study Oversight of MPOs
Sponsors
Rep. Elmer Floyd [D] | Rep. Marvin Lucas [D] | Rep. Edward Hanes [D] | Rep. Charles Graham [D] |
Sen. Carl Ford [R] | Rep. Charles Jeter [R] | Rep. Rodney Moore [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-15 - House - Second Reading (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | Senate | Ref To Com On Transportation |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-05-15 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-14 | House | Placed On Cal For 05/15/2013 |
2013-05-14 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-05-14 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-05-14 | House | Serial Referral To Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House Stricken |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Transportation, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |