NC H378 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-22 - Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources
Pending: Senate Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amd. Criteria/Certain Ag. Cost-Share Pgms
Title
Amd. Criteria/Certain Ag. Cost-Share Pgms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - Second Reading (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-04-22 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-04-21 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | House | Ref To Com On Agriculture |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed |