NC H38 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-22 - Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
Pending: Senate Education/Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Entry Fees for HS Interscholastic Events
Title
Entry Fees for HS Interscholastic Events
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - House - Second Reading (Y: 106 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-22 | Senate | Re-ref to Education/Higher Education. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ref To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2023-04-20 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2023-04-19 | House | Added to Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2023-04-19 | House | Reptd Fav |
2023-04-18 | House | Re-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-04-18 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2023-02-01 | House | Ref to the Com on Education - K-12, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House |
2023-02-01 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
115C | (n/a) | Citation Text | ||
115C | 407.55 | (n/a) | Citation Text |