NC H383 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-12 - Ch. SL 2013-102
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amend Grain Dealer Licensing Laws.-AB
Title
Amend Grain Dealer Licensing Laws.-AB
Sponsors
Rep. John Bell [R] | Rep. James Langdon [R] | Rep. James Dixon [R] | Rep. Charles Jeter [R] |
Rep. Phillip Shepard [R] | Rep. Michael Wray [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - Senate - SECOND READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-11 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-12 | Ch. SL 2013-102 | |
2013-06-12 | Signed by Gov. 6/12/2013 | |
2013-06-06 | Pres. To Gov. 6/6/2013 | |
2013-06-05 | Ratified | |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Ordered Enrolled |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed On Cal For 06/04/2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Ref To Com On Agriculture/Environment/Natural Resources |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Rec From House |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed On Cal For 04/11/2013 |
2013-04-10 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2013-04-10 | House | Reptd Fav |
2013-04-03 | House | Re-ref Com On Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-04-03 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2013-03-21 | House | Ref to the Com on Agriculture, if favorable, Judiciary Subcommittee A |
2013-03-21 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2013-03-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S386 (Same As) 2013-07-23 - Ch. SL 2013-342