NC H383 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Ch. SL 2019-44
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Topsail Beach Charter/Board Vacancies

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Topsail Beach Charter/Board Vacancies

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-24 - House - M11 Concur (Y: 100 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Amendment 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Second Reading (Y: 97 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - M6 Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 105 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - M6 Reconsider Second Reading (Y: 107 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25 Ch. SL 2019-44
2019-06-25 Ratified
2019-06-24HouseOrdered Enrolled
2019-06-24HouseConcurred In S Com Sub
2019-06-19HousePlaced On Cal For 06/24/2019
2019-06-19HouseCal Pursuant 36(b)
2019-06-18HouseRegular Message Received For Concurrence in S Com Sub
2019-06-18SenateRegular Message Sent To House
2019-06-17SenateEngrossed
2019-06-17SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-17SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-17SenateAmend Adopted A1
2019-06-13SenatePlaced On Cal For 06/17/2019
2019-06-13SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-11SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-11SenateCom Substitute Adopted
2019-06-11SenateReptd Fav Com Substitute
2019-05-21SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-21SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-05-02SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-05-02SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-05-02SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-05-01HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-04-30HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-30HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-29HousePlaced On Cal For 04/30/2019
2019-04-29HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-04-29HouseReptd Fav
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Cal
2019-04-25HouseReconsidered 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HouseReconsidered 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-04-25HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-04-25HouseAdded to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseWithdrawn From Com
2019-04-25HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-04-25HouseReptd Fav
2019-03-20HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-03-20HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-19HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.ncleg.gov/BillLookUp/2019/H383
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v0.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v1.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v2.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v3.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v4.pdf
Texthttps://www.ncleg.gov/Sessions/2019/Bills/House/PDF/H383v5.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/205
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/204
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/202
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/302
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/S/303
Roll Callhttps://www.ncleg.gov/Legislation/Votes/RollCallVoteTranscript/2019/H/519

Bill Comments

feedback