NC H385 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging
Pending: Senate Pensions & Retirement & Aging Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Sheriffs' Supp. Pension Fund Changes
Title
Sheriffs' Supp. Pension Fund Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-01 - House - Third Reading (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - House - Second Reading (Y: 108 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Re-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate |
2015-09-15 | Senate | Withdrawn From Com |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Ref To Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-06-02 | Senate | Regular Message Received From House |
2015-06-02 | House | Regular Message Sent To Senate |
2015-06-01 | House | Passed 3rd Reading |
2015-05-28 | House | Passed 2nd Reading |
2015-05-28 | House | Added to Calendar |
2015-05-28 | House | Cal Pursuant Rule 36(b) |
2015-05-28 | House | Reptd Fav |
2015-04-21 | House | Re-ref Com On Finance |
2015-04-21 | House | Reptd Fav Com Substitute |
2015-03-30 | House | Ref to the Com on Pensions and Retirement, if favorable, Finance |
2015-03-30 | House | Passed 1st Reading |
2015-03-26 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S404 (Same As) 2015-03-26 - Re-ref Com On Pensions & Retirement and Aging