NC H4 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Ch. SL 2019-93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Claremont Deannexation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Claremont Deannexation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-01 - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Second Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - Third Reading (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - Second Reading (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08 Ch. SL 2019-93
2019-07-08 Ratified
2019-07-01SenateOrdered Enrolled
2019-07-01SenatePassed 3rd Reading
2019-06-27SenatePlaced On Cal For 07/01/2019
2019-06-27SenatePassed 2nd Reading
2019-06-26SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-25SenateRe-ref Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-25SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-18SenateRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-06-18SenateReptd Fav
2019-06-12SenateRe-ref to State and Local Government. If fav, re-ref to Finance. If fav, re-ref to Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-06-12SenateWithdrawn From Com
2019-03-11SenateRef To Com On Rules and Operations of the Senate
2019-03-11SenatePassed 1st Reading
2019-03-11SenateRegular Message Received From House
2019-03-08HouseRegular Message Sent To Senate
2019-03-07HousePassed 3rd Reading
2019-03-06HousePassed 2nd Reading
2019-03-04HousePlaced On Cal For 03/06/2019
2019-03-04HouseCal Pursuant Rule 36(b)
2019-03-04HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-27HouseRe-ref Com On Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-02-27HouseReptd Fav
2019-02-06HouseRe-ref Com On Finance
2019-02-06HouseReptd Fav
2019-01-31HouseRef to the Com on State and Local Government, if favorable, Finance, if favorable, Rules, Calendar, and Operations of the House
2019-01-31HousePassed 1st Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled

North Carolina State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback